In re: USA, et al v. USDC-CASF
: In re: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and ELAINE C. DUKE
Petitioner,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Respondent,: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, SAN FRANCISCO
Real Party In Interest,: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, JANET NAPOLITANO, In her official capacity as President of the University of California, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MARYLAND, CITY OF SAN JOSE, DULCE GARCIA, MIRIAM GONZALEZ AVILA, SAUL JIMENEZ SUAREZ, VIRIDIANA CHABOLLA MENDOZA, JIRAYUT LATTHIVONGSKORN, NORMA RAMIREZ, COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA and SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 521
Case Number: 17-72917
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 16, 2017 Summary IN RE UNITED STATES
November 18, 2017 Summary IN RE UNITED STATES
November 21, 2017 Summary IN RE UNITED STATES
December 21, 2017 Summary IN RE UNITED STATES

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9029544838 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and PAUL J. WATFORD) Before the court is the government s emergency motion for a stay of our order of November 16, 2017, which denied the government s petition for a writ of mandamus and lifted a temporary stay that we had previously imposed. As the order denying mandamus relief was effective immediately upon its issuance, see Ellis v. U.S. Dist. Court, 360 F.3d 1022, 1023 (9th Cir. 2004) (en banc), jurisdiction now lies with the district court, and not with this court. Compare Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft v. U.S. Dist. Court, 805 F.2d 340, 341 42 (10th Cir. 1986) (ordering a stay of district court proceedings before any order denying or granting mandamus had issued). If the government seeks further relief from this court, it must do so in a new petition for mandamus. The government s emergency motion for a stay is therefore DISMISSED. IT IS SO ORDERED. [10663072]
November 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9029537728 Filed Order for PUBLICATION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RONALD M. GOULD and PAUL J. WATFORD) The court has received the government s November 17, 2017 emergency stay motion. The response to the motion is due Monday, November 20, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. PST, and the optional reply is due Monday, November 20, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. PST. In addition to all other issues the parties wish to raise in the response and reply, the parties shall address whether this court has jurisdiction to grant a stay of proceedings, or whether the motion for a stay should instead be filed in the district court. See Ellis v. U.S. Dist. Court, 360 F.3d 1022 (9th Cir. 2004) (en banc). [10659828]
Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: USA, et al v. USDC-CASF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Thomas G. Pulham
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Thomas G. Pulham
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Thomas G. Pulham
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner,: ELAINE C. DUKE, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Thomas G. Pulham
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent,: UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: JANET NAPOLITANO, In her official capacity as President of the University of California
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Davidson
Represented By: Charles Furlonge Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Kathleen Vermazen Radez
Represented By: James F. Zahradka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: James F. Zahradka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: James F. Zahradka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Steven Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: CITY OF SAN JOSE
Represented By: J. Richard Doyle
Represented By: Nancy L. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: DULCE GARCIA
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: MIRIAM GONZALEZ AVILA
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: SAUL JIMENEZ SUAREZ
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: VIRIDIANA CHABOLLA MENDOZA
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: JIRAYUT LATTHIVONGSKORN
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: NORMA RAMIREZ
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous
Represented By: Erwin Chemerinsky
Represented By: Judy London
Represented By: Mark D. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA
Represented By: Greta Suzanne Hansen
Represented By: Eric P. Brown
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Laura S. Trice
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Real party in interest,: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 521
Represented By: Greta Suzanne Hansen
Represented By: Eric P. Brown
Represented By: Stacey Leyton
Represented By: Laura S. Trice
Represented By: Jonathan Weissglass
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?