USA v. Rafael Quiroz
Defendant / Appellant: RAFAEL QUIROZ
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-10160
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 30, 2020 USA V. RAFAEL QUIROZ

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Filed Appellant Rafael Quiroz FORM 27 motion for appeal brief; remand for resentencing. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355531] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:23 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Rafael Quiroz CJA 23 financial affidavit. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355529] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:21 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Rafael Quiroz FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355523] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:19 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Rafael Quiroz FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355519] (RL) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:18 PM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 A copy of 6/24/2019 order [ # 5 ], a Form CJA 23, and an informal brief packet were on appellant individually at Reg. No. 11467-097, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 019001, Atwater, California 95301, via U.S. Mail. [11342024] (AF) [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:33 AM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DV): Pursuant to this courts limited remand, on May 26, 2019, the district court granted appellants motion for an extension of time to file the notice of appeal. Thus, the notice of appeal is deemed timely filed and the appeal shall proceed. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(b)(4). The following briefing schedule shall govern this appeal. Appellants opening brief is due August 6, 2019; appellees answering brief is due September 5, 2019; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Because appellant is a pro se prisoner proceeding without the assistance of counsel appellant need not file the initial excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or ordered appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in appellees brief. See Fed. R. App. P. 30-1.7. The Clerk shall serve this order, a Form CJA 23 and an informal brief packet on appellant individually at Reg. No. 11467-097, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 019001, Atwater, California 95301. [11342012] (AF) [Entered: 06/24/2019 11:28 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Received copy of District Court order filed on 05/26/2019 ORDER. Order extending time for filing notice of appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 4(b)(4). The court therefore grants defendant an extension of the time for filing a Notice of Appeal to thirty days after the expiration of the time for the filing of such notice and also deems his Notice of Appeal received May 6, 2019 to have been timely filed. See Fed. R. App. Proc. 4(b)(4). The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and to serve this order on defendant Rafael Quiroz at his address of record as is also reflected in the Ninth Circuits May 20, 2019 order remanding the matter for this courts determination. IT IS SO ORDERED. [11311418] (RL) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:18 AM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): On May 6, 2019, appellant filed, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(c)(1), a notice of appeal from the district courts order entered on April 4, 2019. Because the notice of appeal was filed more than 14 days after entry of the order, it was not timely under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(b)(1)(A). The notice of appeal was, however, filed within 30 days after the expiration of the time to file the notice of appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(b)(4). Accordingly, this case is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of permitting the district court to provide appellant notice and an opportunity to request that the time for filing the notice of appeal be extended, for a period not to exceed 30 days from the expiration of the time prescribed by Rule 4(b), upon a finding of excusable neglect or good cause. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(b)(4); United States v. Ono, 72 F.3d 101, 103 (9th Cir. 1995) (order); United States v. Stolarz, 547 F.2d 108 (9th Cir. 1976). The district court is requested to make this determination at its earliest convenience and to send to this court a copy of its order setting forth the basis for its determination. The district court is also requested to serve its orders on appellant at the following address: Reg. No. 11467-097, United States Penitentiary, P.O. Box 019001, Atwater, California 95301. The proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts determination. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district judge. (AppComm Direct Criminal) [11302764] (OC) [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:54 AM]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-10160: IFP Pending In DC] ). [11302381] (DJV) [Entered: 05/20/2019 09:38 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: Life Custody. Transcript ordered by 05/28/2019. Transcript due 06/26/2019. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 08/05/2019 for Rafael Quiroz. Appellee brief due 09/04/2019 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11291824] (JMR) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Rafael Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RAFAEL QUIROZ
Represented By: Rafael Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Servatius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?