Winnie Fang v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner
Plaintiff / Appellant: WINNIE B. FANG, M.D.
Defendant / Appellee: MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC.
Case Number: 19-15022
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11198829] (VS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:29 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11176190] (VS) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:31 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11156375] (AD) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:46 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Winnie B. Fang Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/16/2019. [11155992] [19-15022] (Palmer, William) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:20 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [11151122] (LW) [Entered: 01/14/2019 08:53 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellant Winnie B. Fang opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellee Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141907] (JBS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Winnie Fang v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WINNIE B. FANG, M.D.
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITH, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Horwich
Represented By: John B. Major
Represented By: James Rutten Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?