Dora Lee, et al v. Postmates, Inc.
Plaintiff: JOSHUA ALBERT, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Plaintiff / Appellant: KELLYN TIMMERMAN and DORA LEE
Defendant / Appellee: POSTMATES, INC.
Case Number: 19-15024
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The assessment conference previously scheduled for January 28, 2019, is canceled. This appeal is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11156010] (BS) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:25 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/28/2019, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11154183] (BS) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:30 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/08/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11145338] (AD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 12:44 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Dora Lee and Kellyn Timmerman Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/08/2019. [11144329] [19-15024] (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) [Entered: 01/08/2019 07:14 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellants Dora Lee and Kellyn Timmerman opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellee Postmates, Inc. answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141959] (JBS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 01:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dora Lee, et al v. Postmates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KELLYN TIMMERMAN
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DORA LEE
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POSTMATES, INC.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Peter C. Squeri
Represented By: Michele L. Maryott Esquire
Represented By: Dhananjay Manthripragada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA ALBERT, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?