Aaron Gbotoe v. David Jennings, et al
Undetermined: AARON GBOTOE, ELAINE C. DUKE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General, THOMAS HOMAN and DAVID W. JENNINGS
Case Number: 19-15065
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/28/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 02/27/2019 ). [11210048] (MS) [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:41 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/27/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11185297] (VS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:30 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11159135] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jefferson B. Sessions, III, David W. Jennings, Thomas Homan and Elaine C. Duke Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11158638] [19-15065] (Halaska, Alexander) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:17 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/11/2019. Transcript due 03/11/2019. Appellants Elaine C. Duke, Thomas Homan, David W. Jennings and Jefferson B. Sessions III, Attorney General opening brief due 04/22/2019. Appellee Aaron Gbotoe answering brief due 05/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11149751] (JBS) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Gbotoe v. David Jennings, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AARON GBOTOE
Represented By: Etan Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ELAINE C. DUKE
Represented By: Michelle Lo
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS III, Attorney General
Represented By: Michelle Lo
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Michelle Lo
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DAVID W. JENNINGS
Represented By: Michelle Lo
Represented By: Alexander Halaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?