John Doe, et al v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, Five
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION and CAREMARK RX, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: CAREMARK CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY PHARMACY, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, TIME WARNER, INC., CVS PHARMACY, INC., LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. and NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, DBA Amtrak
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN DOE, Two, JOHN DOE, Four; on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, JOHN DOE, Three and JOHN DOE, One
Case Number: 19-15074
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 19 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11211006] (CL) [Entered: 02/28/2019 09:56 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/26/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11185389] (VS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:55 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 Added attorney Sean K. McMahan for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, in case 19-15074. [11164527] (QDL) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:58 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sean K. McMahan for Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Date of service: 01/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11164525] [19-15074] (McMahan, Sean) [Entered: 01/24/2019 08:56 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 Added attorney Elise Attridge for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, in case 19-15074. [11163581] (QDL) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:48 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elise M. Attridge for Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Date of service: 01/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11163563] [19-15074] (Attridge, Elise) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:41 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 Added attorney Brian W. Shaffer for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, in case 19-15074. [11163352] (QDL) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:59 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brian W. Shaffer for Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Date of service: 01/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11163347] [19-15074] (Shaffer, Brian) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:58 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees Caremark California Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Caremark, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161561] [19-15074] (O'Connor, Sarah) [Entered: 01/22/2019 01:43 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellee Time Warner, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161412] [19-15074] (Bernstein, Michael) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:59 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11161378] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:45 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11161376] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11161371] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants John Doe, John Doe, John Doe and John Doe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161326] [19-15074] (Mansfield, Alan) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:36 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellee National Railroad Passenger Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161248] [19-15074] (Chapman, Ellie) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:03 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Lowe's Companies, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11160807] [19-15074] (Eskenazi, Phillip) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:24 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Sarah Lochner O'Connor for Caremark, LLC, Caremark California Specialty Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc., in case 19-15074. [11160458] (QDL) [Entered: 01/22/2019 08:54 AM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Lochner O'Connor for Appellees Caremark California Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Caremark, LLC and CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Date of service: 01/21/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11160147] [19-15074] (O'Connor, Sarah) [Entered: 01/21/2019 07:48 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/11/2019. Transcript due 03/12/2019. Appellant John Doe opening brief due 04/22/2019. Appellees CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark California Specialty Pharmacy, LLC, Caremark, LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc., National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Time Warner, Inc. answering brief due 05/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11151563] (JMR) [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe, et al v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREMARK RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK CALIFORNIA SPECIALTY PHARMACY, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Lochner O'Connor
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAREMARK, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Lochner O'Connor
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIME WARNER, INC.
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Sarah Lochner O'Connor
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Phillip J. Eskenazi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, DBA Amtrak
Represented By: Sean K. McMahan
Represented By: Ellie Frances Chapman Esquire
Represented By: Brian W. Shaffer Esquire
Represented By: Elise Attridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DOE, Two
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DOE, Four; on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DOE, Three
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DOE, One
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, Five
Represented By: Joe R. Whatley Jr.
Represented By: Alan M. Mansfield Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?