People of the State of CA v. Tania McCash
Defendant / Appellant: TANIA R. MCCASH
Plaintiff / Appellee: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Case Number: 19-15076
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Tania R. McCash motion to correct date of filing on document of February 14, 2019. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/27/2019. [11210390] (QDL) [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:08 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Tania R. McCash response to order to show cause dated 01/24/2019. Served on 02/14/2019. [11199842] (QDL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 03:00 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): A review of the record suggests that this appeal may be appropriate for summary disposition under Ninth Circuit Rule 3-6(b). See United States v. Hooton, 693 F.2d 857, 858 (9th Cir. 1982) (per curiam) (stating standard for summary affirmance); see also Patel v. Del Taco Inc., 446 F.3d 996, 999 (9th Cir. 2006) (stating standard for removal under section 1443). Within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall move to voluntarily dismiss this appeal, or show cause why summary affirmance of the district courts remand order is not appropriate. If appellant does not comply with this order, this appeal will be automatically dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Briefing is stayed pending disposition of this order to show cause. [11165006] (CKP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:12 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Received copy of District Court order filed on 01/14/2019 granting application to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. [11157719] (QDL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:13 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tania R. McCash opening brief due 03/12/2019. [11151722] (JBS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of CA v. Tania McCash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TANIA R. MCCASH
Represented By: Tania R. McCash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?