Christiana Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC and THE PRESERVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHRISTIANA TRUST, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3
Case Number: 19-15096
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 14, 2020 CHRISTIANA TRUST V. SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (JW): A dial-in telephonic conference will be held on March 18, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. Please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov if counsel does not receive an email or if additional participants should be added. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellant shall file an opening brief on or before May 2, 2019; appellee shall file an answering brief on or before June 3, 2019; appellant may file an optional reply brief within twenty one (21) days from the service date of the answering brief. [11198029] (RT) [Entered: 02/15/2019 04:43 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/14/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11178156] (BS) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:14 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/24/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11165233] (AD) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:44 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/24/2019. [11165034] [19-15096] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:19 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/24/2019. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 03/18/2019. Appellee Christiana Trust answering brief due 04/16/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11156828] (JBS) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Christiana Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTIANA TRUST, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee of ARLP Trust 3
Represented By: Aaron D. Lancaster
Represented By: Edgar C. Smith
Represented By: Richard Samuel Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRESERVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?