CitiMortgage, Inc. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC and MISSION HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Undetermined: CITIMORTGAGE, INC., SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC and DAVID A. YEAKEL
Case Number: 19-15235
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 04/30/2019. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11213363] (MS) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:47 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Richard Aaron Chastain for CitiMortgage, Inc., in case 19-15235. [11203476] (JFF) [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:45 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain for Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 02/21/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11203052] [19-15235] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:26 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Stephen Colmery Parsley for CitiMortgage, Inc., in case 19-15235. [11203020] (JFF) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:17 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen C. Parsley for Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc.. Date of service: 02/21/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11202937] [19-15235] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:44 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 3/01/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11200154] (BS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:55 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/12/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11188131] (AD) [Entered: 02/12/2019 06:44 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2019. [11188123] [19-15235] (Gilbert, Jacqueline) [Entered: 02/12/2019 06:39 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2019. Transcript ordered by 03/11/2019. Transcript due 04/09/2019. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC opening brief due 05/20/2019. Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc. answering brief due 06/18/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11185118] (JBS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: William Habdas
Represented By: Melanie Dawn Morgan Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: DAVID A. YEAKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSION HILLS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?