Bank of America, N.A. v. TRP Fund VI LLC, et al
Defendant: SILVERSTONE RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, HAMPTON & HAMPTON COLLECTIONS, LLC and CONTRA INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Defendant / Appellant: TRP FUND VI LLC
Case Number: 19-15454
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/17/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11269974] (CL) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:40 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/17/2019, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11260097] (CL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:17 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Added attorney Richard Aaron Chastain for Bank of America, N.A.. [11252687] (RL) [Entered: 04/04/2019 09:41 AM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Richard Aaron Chastain for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11252491] [19-15454] (Chastain, Richard) [Entered: 04/04/2019 08:10 AM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Matthew Bowness for Bank of America, N.A.. [11251685] (RL) [Entered: 04/03/2019 01:08 PM]
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew Jack Bowness for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 04/03/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11251606] [19-15454] (Bowness, Matthew) [Entered: 04/03/2019 12:20 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Stephen Colmery Parsley for Bank of America, N.A.. [11244845] (RL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:07 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Stephen Colmery Parsley for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11244729] [19-15454] (Parsley, Stephen) [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:45 AM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 04/08/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11239919] (CL) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:35 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11231753] (AD) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:44 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant TRP Fund VI LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2019. [11231328] [19-15454] (Hong, Joseph) [Entered: 03/18/2019 10:43 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/20/2019. Appellant TRP Fund VI LLC opening brief due 05/13/2019. Appellee Bank of America, N.A. answering brief due 06/13/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11226514] (RT) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. TRP Fund VI LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Successor By Merger To Bac Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Represented By: Matthew Bowness Esquire
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Represented By: Stephen Colmery Parsley Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVERSTONE RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMPTON & HAMPTON COLLECTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTRA INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRP FUND VI LLC
Represented By: Joseph Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?