Jeffrey Moore v. Cocks, et al
Defendant: JIM MCCABE, COWIN, ANHOLD, DON BISCHOFF, UNKNOWN PARTIES, John Does 1-10; Jane Does 1-5 - Jail Staff at M.C.A.D.F. ; Jane Doe - Facilities Sole Classifications Officer/PREA Rep at MCADF, COUNTY OF MOHAVE, SIMMERS and NAVA
Defendant / Appellee: COCKS, LT - Administration at MCADF, OCUMBA, Detention Officer at MCADF, RAMSEY, ORR, Training Officer at M.C.A.D.F. and HULL, Officer - Discipline at MCADF
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEFFREY AARON MOORE
Case Number: 19-15569
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 11, 2020 JEFFREY MOORE V. COCKS

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellees Cocks, Hull, Ocumba, Orr and Ramsey response opposing motion ([ # 6 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 05/03/2019. [11286243] [19-15569] (Acedo, Nicholas) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:52 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Added attorney Nicholas D. Acedo for Cocks, Orr, Ramsey, Hull and Ocumba, in case 19-15569. [11286223] (QDL) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:46 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nicholas D. Acedo for Appellees Cocks, Hull, Ocumba, Ramsey and Orr. Date of service: 05/03/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11286169] [19-15569] (Acedo, Nicholas) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:28 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Jeffrey Aaron Moore opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 04/07/2019. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11275503] (KWG) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:09 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Jeffrey Aaron Moore motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 04/13/2019. [11274278] (QDL) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:26 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11259246] (CKP) [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:41 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 04/03/2019. [Case Number 19-15569: Partially Paid] [11256995] (QDL) [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:09 PM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11246376] (CKP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:44 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeffrey Aaron Moore opening brief due 05/28/2019. Appellees Cocks, Hull, Ocumba, Orr and Ramsey answering brief due 06/24/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11245099] (JPD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:04 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 Incorrect entry- Terminated Ashlee Fletcher and Rachel Love for Unknown Parties in 19-15569 [11245081] (JPD) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeffrey Moore v. Cocks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM MCCABE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANHOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON BISCHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PARTIES, John Does 1-10; Jane Does 1-5 - Jail Staff at M.C.A.D.F. ; Jane Doe - Facilities Sole Classifications Officer/PREA Rep at MCADF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF MOHAVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COCKS, LT - Administration at MCADF
Represented By: Ashlee Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCUMBA, Detention Officer at MCADF
Represented By: Ashlee Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMSEY
Represented By: Ashlee Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORR, Training Officer at M.C.A.D.F.
Represented By: Ashlee Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HULL, Officer - Discipline at MCADF
Represented By: Ashlee Fletcher
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY AARON MOORE
Represented By: Jeffrey Aaron Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?