Georgette Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: GEORGETTE G. PURNELL
Defendant / Appellee: RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. and SERVICE WEST, INC.
Case Number: 19-15768
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MANDATE ISSUED. (DFO, WAF and PJW) [11298148] (QDL) [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:43 AM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Medhekar v. United States Dist. Court, 99 F.3d 325, 326 (9th Cir. 1996) (discovery orders not immediately appealable); United States v. Washington, 573 F.2d 1121, 1122 (9th Cir. 1978) (order denying motion to disqualify judge is not final or appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11273583] (JBS) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:15 AM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Georgette G. Purnell opening brief due 06/14/2019. Appellees Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. and Service West, Inc. answering brief due 07/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11266300] (RT) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Georgette Purnell v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGETTE G. PURNELL
Represented By: Georgette G. Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC.
Represented By: Mark J. Divelbiss Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERVICE WEST, INC.
Represented By: Kristin E. Hutchins Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?