A. B., et al v. Chart Industries, Inc., et al
Defendant: PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER, PACIFIC MSO, LLC and PRELUDE FERTILITY, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: K. L., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, E. F., C. D., A. B., G. H. and I. J.
Not Classified By Court: In re: PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER LITIGATION
Not Yet Classified: SHERLENE WONG and LAWRENCE WONG
Defendant / Appellant: CHART INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 19-15885
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 15, 2020 A. B. V. CHART INDUSTRIES, INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11314166] [19-15885, 19-15886, 19-15888] (BS) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:35 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Added attorney Adam Brett Wolf for G. H. I. J. A. B. K. L. C. D. E. F., in case 19-15885. [11313683] (NAC) [Entered: 05/30/2019 01:06 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam B. Wolf for Appellees A. B., C. D., E. F., G. H., I. J. and K. L.. Date of service: 05/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11313592] [19-15885] (Wolf, Adam) [Entered: 05/30/2019 12:14 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Adam Eric Polk for G. H. I. J. A. B. K. L. C. D. E. F., in case 19-15885. [11310459] (NAC) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:06 PM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam E. Polk for Appellees A. B., C. D., E. F., G. H., I. J. and K. L.. Date of service: 05/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11310443] [19-15885] (Polk, Adam) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:01 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Christina C. Sharp for G. H. I. J. A. B. K. L. C. D. E. F., in case 19-15885. [11308942] (NAC) [Entered: 05/24/2019 02:16 PM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christina C. Sharp for Appellees A. B., C. D., E. F., G. H., I. J. and K. L.. Date of service: 05/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11308939] [19-15885] (Sharp, Christina) [Entered: 05/24/2019 02:15 PM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/30/2019, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11296114] [19-15885, 19-15886, 19-15888] (CL) [Entered: 05/14/2019 07:44 AM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11286727] (AD) [Entered: 05/03/2019 06:44 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Chart Industries, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/03/2019. [11286159] [19-15885] (Peterson, Thomas) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:24 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/03/2019. Transcript ordered by 05/23/2019. Transcript due 06/24/2019. Appellant Chart Industries, Inc. opening brief due 08/05/2019. Appellees A. B., C. D., E. F., G. H., I. J., K. L., Lawrence Wong and Sherlene Wong answering brief due 09/05/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11279220] (RT) [Entered: 04/26/2019 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: A. B., et al v. Chart Industries, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: K. L., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: E. F.
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: C. D.
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: A. B.
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: G. H.
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: I. J.
Represented By: Tracey Berger Cowan Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: Lexi Hazam
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: Dylan Hughes
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Adam Eric Polk
Represented By: Christina C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SHERLENE WONG
Represented By: David Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: David M. Rosenberg-Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: LAWRENCE WONG
Represented By: David Rosenberg-Wohl
Represented By: David M. Rosenberg-Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC FERTILITY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC MSO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRELUDE FERTILITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHART INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane Esquire
Represented By: Thomas M. Peterson
Represented By: David L. Schrader Esquire
Represented By: Megan A. Suehiro
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?