City & County of San Francisco v. William Barr, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Defendant / Appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, MATT M. DUMMERMUTH, Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 19-15947
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - , DIAL-IN FurtherConference, 07/17/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11315129] [19-15947, 19-15950] (VS) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:58 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/31/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11309796] [19-15947, 19-15950] (MS) [Entered: 05/28/2019 09:34 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11293431] (AD) [Entered: 05/10/2019 12:44 PM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants William P. Barr, DOJ and Matt M. Dummermuth Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/10/2019. [11293320] [19-15947] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:34 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Added attorney Daniel Tenny for Matt M. Dummermuth William P. Barr DOJ, in case 19-15947. [11292620] (JFF) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:42 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny for Appellants William P. Barr, DOJ and Matt M. Dummermuth. Date of service: 05/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11292105] [19-15947] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:56 AM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Attorneys Daniel D. Mauler, substituted by Attorneys Laura Myron [11289837] (JFF) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:55 PM]
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Laura E Myron for Appellants William P. Barr, DOJ and Matt M. Dummermuth. Substitution for Attorney Daniel D. Mauler for Appellants William P. Barr, Matt M. Dummermuth and DOJ. Date of service: 05/07/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11289753] [19-15947] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 05/07/2019 03:20 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/10/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/03/2019. Transcript due 07/02/2019. Appellants William P. Barr, Attorney General, Matt M. Dummermuth and United States Department of Justice opening brief due 08/12/2019. Appellee City and County of San Francisco answering brief due 09/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11285667] (JBS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City & County of San Francisco v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Tara Michelle Steeley Esquire
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Represented By: Sara J. Eisenberg
Represented By: Yvonne R. Mere
Represented By: Aileen McGrath
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MATT M. DUMMERMUTH, Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?