Alicia Kuhl, et al v. City of Santa Cruz, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SUSIE O'HARA, Santa Cruz Management Analyst, SANTA CRUZ CITY COUNCIL, ANDREW MILLS, Santa Cruz Chief of Police, MARTIN BERNAL, Santa Cruz City Manager, TINA SHULL, Santa Cruz City Manager, CITY OF SANTA CRUZ and TAKE BACK SANTA CRUZ
Plaintiff / Appellant: SHANNON VUDMUSKA, ALICIA KUHL, and All Others Similarly Situated Residents of The Ross Homeless Encampment, RAFAEL SALDANA, JUAN MACEDO, MICHAEL SWEATT, CRYSTAL OLSSON, DESIEIRE QUINTERO, SANTOS MENDEZ, VANESSA MONTOYA, SUNNY LOPEZ and MARK HEMERBACH
Case Number: 19-16104
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Mail returned on 06/14/2019 addressed to Alicia Kuhl, re: 05/29/2019 case opening information [ # 2 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, attempted - not known, unable to forward. Resending to: c/o Homeless Service Center, 115 Coral Street, Santa Cruz, CA 95060 with copy of 06/04/2019 order [ # 4 ]. [11332348]--[Edited docket text. 06/14/2019 by LA]--[Edited: address updated. 06/14/2019 by RY] (LA) [Entered: 06/14/2019 03:03 PM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court signed by Dsieire Quintero. [11328362] (RT) [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:00 PM]
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Catherine Mary Bronson for City of Santa Cruz, in case 19-16104. [11325948] (CW) [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:53 AM]
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Catherine Mary Bronson for Appellee City of Santa Cruz. Date of service: 06/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11325805] [19-16104] (Bronson, Catherine) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:04 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): The appeal filed May 28, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed shall be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). The briefing schedule is stayed pending resolution of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis, which will be addressed by separate order. [11318765] (CKP) [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:22 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Alicia Kuhl motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/28/2019. [11312602] (RT) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:25 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11312582] (RT) [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:19 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Attorney Catherine Mary Bronson in 19-16104 substituted by Attorney Anthony P. Condotti in 19-16104 [11312409] (RT) [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alicia Kuhl, et al v. City of Santa Cruz, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSIE O'HARA, Santa Cruz Management Analyst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANTA CRUZ CITY COUNCIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW MILLS, Santa Cruz Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARTIN BERNAL, Santa Cruz City Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TINA SHULL, Santa Cruz City Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF SANTA CRUZ
Represented By: Anthony P. Condotti Esquire
Represented By: Catherine Mary Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAKE BACK SANTA CRUZ
Represented By: Brad C. Brereton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHANNON VUDMUSKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALICIA KUHL, and All Others Similarly Situated Residents of The Ross Homeless Encampment
Represented By: Alicia Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL SALDANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUAN MACEDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL SWEATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRYSTAL OLSSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DESIEIRE QUINTERO
Represented By: Desieire Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANTOS MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANESSA MONTOYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUNNY LOPEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK HEMERBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?