Frank Rosenblum v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., as successor-in-interest to Washington Mutual Bank and U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK ROSENBLUM
Case Number: 19-16259
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 18, 2020 FRANK ROSENBLUM V. U.S. BANK

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11362535] (CL) [Entered: 07/12/2019 05:01 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/02/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11352935][19-16259] (AD) [Entered: 07/02/2019 06:44 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Frank Rosenblum Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/02/2019. [11352862] [19-16259] (Seymour, James) [Entered: 07/02/2019 05:05 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/01/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11351365][19-16259] (AD) [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:44 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/01/2019. [11350811] [19-16259] (Gerlt, Mariel) [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:53 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/02/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/24/2019. Transcript due 08/23/2019. Appellant Frank Rosenblum opening brief due 10/02/2019. Appellees JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association answering brief due 11/01/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11343545] (JPD) [Entered: 06/25/2019 11:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frank Rosenblum v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1
Represented By: Mariel Gerlt
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., as successor-in-interest to Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Mariel Gerlt
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7
Represented By: Mariel Gerlt
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK ROSENBLUM
Represented By: James H. Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?