Zane Hubbard v. State Justice Institute Act of, et al
Defendant / Appellee: STATE JUSTICE INSTITUTE ACT OF 1984, JOHN W. LUA, Judge, Kern County Superior Court, F. N. U. JENNINGS, JAMES D. SIMSON, Kern County District Attorney and THE PEOPLE OF KERN COUNTY
Plaintiff / Appellant: ZANE HUBBARD
Case Number: 19-16272
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Zane Hubbard motion for legal aid assistance. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/01/2019. [11408969] (QDL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:43 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Zane Hubbard motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/01/2019. [11408964] (QDL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:42 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Zane Hubbard motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: Case closed. Served on 08/01/2019. [11408921]--[COURT UPDATE: Backdated entry to reflect correct filing date. 08/23/2019 by SLM] (QDL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:27 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Zane Hubbard opening brief (Informal: No) 8 pages. Served on 07/16/2019. Major deficiencies: case closed. [11408891] (KWG) [Entered: 08/23/2019 03:17 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to pay fees. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11405712] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:48 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11350324] (CKP) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:54 AM]
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Zane Hubbard opening brief due 08/23/2019. [11345039] (JPD) [Entered: 06/26/2019 10:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zane Hubbard v. State Justice Institute Act of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE JUSTICE INSTITUTE ACT OF 1984
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN W. LUA, Judge, Kern County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: F. N. U. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES D. SIMSON, Kern County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE PEOPLE OF KERN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ZANE HUBBARD
Represented By: Zane Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?