Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC, et al
Not Yet Classified: ASSESSMENT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC, SAN MARCOS AT SUMMERLIN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION and SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 452 CROCUS HILL
Defendant / Appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION
Case Number: 19-16355
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 8, 2020 SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 452 V. GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 09/10/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill opening brief due 11/08/2019. Appellees Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Quality Loan Service Corporation answering brief due 12/09/2019. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11394687] (CL) [Entered: 08/12/2019 03:08 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 08/12/2019, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11372485] (CL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:56 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11367252][19-16355] (AD) [Entered: 07/17/2019 06:44 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/17/2019. [11366882] [19-16355] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:55 PM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney LIndsey Morales substituted by Attorney Justin Grim. [11364723] (RL) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:33 AM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Justin T. Grim (McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLP 1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 130, Las Vegas, NV 89134) for Appellee Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Substitution for Attorney Mrs. LIndsey Morales for Appellee Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Date of service: 07/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11364693] [19-16355] (Grim, Justin) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:24 AM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/17/2019. Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 Crocus Hill opening brief due 09/09/2019. Appellees Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Quality Loan Service Corporation answering brief due 10/07/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11359528] (JBS) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 452 v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ASSESSMENT MANAGEMENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: LIndsey Morales
Represented By: Justin Grim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SAN MARCOS AT SUMMERLIN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 452 CROCUS HILL
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION
Represented By: Gary S. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?