Jacob Benson, et al v. Casa De Capri Enterprises, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JACOB BENSON, an individual, K. B., a minor, by and through Jacob Benson, guardian ad litem, DEBORAH BENSON, husband and wife and JOSEPH BENSON
Not Yet Classified: CONTINUING CARE RISK RETENTION GROUP, INC., Garnishee
Defendant / Appellee: CASA DE CAPRI ENTERPRISES, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company and UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as John Does 1-20; ABC Corporations I-X; XYZ Partnerships I-X
Case Number: 19-16686
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 23, 2020 Summary Benson v. Casa de Capri Enterprises, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11448718] (VS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:51 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/02/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11435416] (CL) [Entered: 09/18/2019 10:19 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11421383][19-16686] (AD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:44 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants K. B., Deborah Benson, Jacob Benson and Joseph Benson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/04/2019. [11421277] [19-16686] (Schwartz, David) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:29 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/05/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/27/2019. Transcript due 10/28/2019. Appellants K. B., Deborah Benson, Jacob Benson and Joseph Benson opening brief due 12/06/2019. Appellees Casa De Capri Enterprises, LLC, Continuing Care Risk Retention Group, Inc. and Unknown Parties answering brief due 01/06/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11414903] (RT) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jacob Benson, et al v. Casa De Capri Enterprises, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACOB BENSON, an individual
Represented By: David Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Harold Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K. B., a minor, by and through Jacob Benson, guardian ad litem
Represented By: David Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Harold Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBORAH BENSON, husband and wife
Represented By: David Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Harold Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH BENSON
Represented By: David Richard Schwartz
Represented By: Harold Wright Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CONTINUING CARE RISK RETENTION GROUP, INC., Garnishee
Represented By: Kelly Ann Hedberg
Represented By: Steven G. Mesaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASA DE CAPRI ENTERPRISES, LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: Dustin A. Christner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTIES, named as John Does 1-20; ABC Corporations I-X; XYZ Partnerships I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?