Anthony Bartling, et al v. Apple Inc.
Not Classified By Court: In re: APPLE PROCESSOR LITIGATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JACQUELINE N. OLSON, JENNIFER ABRAMS, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, ROBERT GIRALDI and ANTHONY BARTLING
Defendant / Appellee: APPLE INC.
Case Number: 19-16720
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 09/27/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11431114] (LW) [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:09 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/11/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11428981][19-16720] (AD) [Entered: 09/11/2019 06:44 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jennifer Abrams, Anthony Bartling, Robert Giraldi and Jacqueline N. Olson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/11/2019. [11428909] [19-16720] (Seaver, Todd) [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:54 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/03/2019. Transcript due 11/04/2019. Appellants Jennifer Abrams, Anthony Bartling, Robert Giraldi and Jacqueline N. Olson opening brief due 12/12/2019. Appellee Apple Inc. answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11419944] (JBS) [Entered: 09/04/2019 09:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Bartling, et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: APPLE PROCESSOR LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACQUELINE N. OLSON
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Represented By: Todd A. Seaver
Represented By: Matt Pearson
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER ABRAMS, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Represented By: Todd A. Seaver
Represented By: Matt Pearson
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT GIRALDI
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Represented By: Todd A. Seaver
Represented By: Matt Pearson
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY BARTLING
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Represented By: Todd A. Seaver
Represented By: Matt Pearson
Represented By: Randall Scott Newman
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Kathleen P. Lally Esquire
Represented By: Mark S. Mester
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Matthew Rawlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?