Debra Knowles, et al v. Superior Court of California, et al
Plaintiff: JAIME SCHMIDT
Defendant: JOEL DEAN
Defendant / Appellee: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, County of Shasta; (erroneously sued herein as Shasta County Marshal's Office)
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN HENRIOULLE, DEBRA KNOWLES and ELIZABETH SAMPSON
Case Number: 19-16754
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 11/06/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/29/2019 ). [11482703] [19-16752, 19-16754] (VS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:05 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 10/29/2019, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11458952] [19-16752, 19-16754] (VS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:24 AM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Received copy of District Court minute order filed on 09/17/2019 - MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the September 19, 2019 hearing on the Motion for Attorney Feeds [152] is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) . [11436115] [19-16752, 19-16754] (CW) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:31 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/02/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court.. [11435972] [19-16754, 19-16752] (MS) [Entered: 09/18/2019 01:31 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CJ): Case The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellants shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellants intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11432340] (TSP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:45 AM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/12/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11430260][19-16754] (AD) [Entered: 09/12/2019 06:44 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Ryan Henrioulle, Debra Knowles and Elizabeth Sampson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/12/2019. [11429942] [19-16754] (Watson, Joshua) [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:58 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/13/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/07/2019. Transcript due 11/06/2019. Appellants Ryan Henrioulle, Debra Knowles and Elizabeth Sampson opening brief due 12/16/2019. Appellee Superior Court of California answering brief due 01/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11423927] (RT) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Debra Knowles, et al v. Superior Court of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, County of Shasta; (erroneously sued herein as Shasta County Marshal's Office)
Represented By: Timothy G. Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN HENRIOULLE
Represented By: Joshua H. Watson
Represented By: Anthony Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRA KNOWLES
Represented By: Joshua H. Watson
Represented By: Anthony Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH SAMPSON
Represented By: Joshua H. Watson
Represented By: Anthony Poidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL DEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?