Lisa Strugala v. Flagstar Bank, FSB
Defendant / Appellee: FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB, a Federal Savings Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: LISA STRUGALA, an individual, on behalf of herself and on behalf of the class of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-16774
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 11, 2020 LISA STRUGALA V. FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11457985] (CL) [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:59 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 09/27/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11431005] (CL) [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:18 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/12/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11429620][19-16774] (AD) [Entered: 09/12/2019 12:44 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Lisa Strugala Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/12/2019. [11429259] [19-16774] (Vendler, David) [Entered: 09/12/2019 09:26 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed on 09/10/19. [11428463] (QDL) [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:10 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Added Attorney(s) David James Vendler for party(s) Appellant Lisa Strugala, in case 19-16774 (omitted in error). [11427375] (JBS) [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:05 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/17/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/10/2019. Transcript due 11/12/2019. Appellant Lisa Strugala opening brief due 12/19/2019. Appellee Flagstar Bank, FSB answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11427036] (JBS) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lisa Strugala v. Flagstar Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLAGSTAR BANK, FSB, a Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: William L. Stern Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA STRUGALA, an individual, on behalf of herself and on behalf of the class of all others similarly situated
Represented By: David James Vendler Esquire
Represented By: Michael R. Brown Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?