Big Sandy Rancheria Enterprise v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BIG SANDY RANCHERIA ENTERPRISES, a federally-chartered corporation
Defendant / Appellee: NICOLAS MADUROS, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration and XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 19-16777
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11459211] (VS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:11 AM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/09/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11443097] (BLS) [Entered: 09/25/2019 10:25 AM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11435843][19-16777] (AD) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:44 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Big Sandy Rancheria Enterprises Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/18/2019. [11435615] [19-16777] (Hennessy, Tim) [Entered: 09/18/2019 11:25 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/10/2019. Transcript due 11/12/2019. Appellant Big Sandy Rancheria Enterprises opening brief due 12/19/2019. Appellees Xavier Becerra and Nicolas Maduros answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11427765] (JBS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 08:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Big Sandy Rancheria Enterprise v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BIG SANDY RANCHERIA ENTERPRISES, a federally-chartered corporation
Represented By: John M. Peebles Esquire
Represented By: Tim J. Hennessy Esquire
Represented By: Michael A. Robinson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLAS MADUROS, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Karen Leaf
Represented By: Peter Nascenzi
Represented By: James Vincent Hart
Represented By: Peter F. Nascenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?