Ditech Financial LLC v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 7904 Li, et al
Defendant: ATC ASSESSMENT COLLECTION GROUP LLC and ELKHORN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 7904 LIMBWOOD
Case Number: 19-16795
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Terminated Ramir Mitchell Hernandez for Ditech Financial LLC in 19-16795 [11482823] (NAC) [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:54 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez, Esquire for Appellee Ditech Financial LLC. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 10/30/2019. [11482804] [19-16795] (Hernandez, Ramir) [Entered: 10/30/2019 09:49 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 11/19/2019, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11482098] (VS) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:46 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 10/29/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11447901] (VS) [Entered: 09/30/2019 09:32 AM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/20/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11438790][19-16795] (AD) [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:44 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 7904 Limbwood Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/20/2019. [11438458] [19-16795] (Bohn, Michael) [Entered: 09/20/2019 10:19 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/20/2019. Transcript ordered by 10/15/2019. Transcript due 11/12/2019. Appellant Saticoy Bay LLC Series 7904 Limbwood opening brief due 12/23/2019. Appellee Ditech Financial LLC answering brief due 01/23/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11430723] (RT) [Entered: 09/13/2019 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 7904 Li, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ramir Mitchell Hernandez Esquire
Represented By: Andrew A. Bao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATC ASSESSMENT COLLECTION GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELKHORN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SATICOY BAY LLC SERIES 7904 LIMBWOOD
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?