Issa Doreh v. Unknown Rodriguez, et al
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Defendant / Appellee: L. R. MOLINAR, named as Ms. Rodriguez, Mail-Room Staff Supervisor at FCI Tucson, UNKNOWN RODRIGUEZ, named as Ms. Rodriguez, Housing Unit Manager at FCI Tucson, W. PRATT, named as Mr. W. Pratt, Food Manager at FCI Tucson and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff / Appellant: ISSA DOREH
Case Number: 19-17062
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Issa Doreh motion for reconsideration. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/06/2019. [11529113] (RL) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:37 PM]
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filed order (JAY S. BYBEE, SANDRA S. IKUTA and JOHN B. OWENS) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11509595] (OC) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:04 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Issa Doreh opening brief due 12/18/2019. Appellees L. R. Molinar, W. Pratt, United States of America and Unknown Rodriguez answering brief due 01/21/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11469306] (RT) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Issa Doreh v. Unknown Rodriguez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. R. MOLINAR, named as Ms. Rodriguez, Mail-Room Staff Supervisor at FCI Tucson
Represented By: Katherine Vail Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN RODRIGUEZ, named as Ms. Rodriguez, Housing Unit Manager at FCI Tucson
Represented By: Katherine Vail Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. PRATT, named as Mr. W. Pratt, Food Manager at FCI Tucson
Represented By: Katherine Vail Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Katherine Vail Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ISSA DOREH
Represented By: Issa Doreh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?