Jeffrey Plaskett v. Ryan McCarthy
Defendant / Appellee: RYAN D. MCCARTHY, Secretary, U. S. Department of the Army
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEFFREY K. PLASKETT
Case Number: 19-17294
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11552833] (VS) [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:19 AM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 12/20/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11523576] (VS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:18 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Lewis Yelin for party(s) Appellee Ryan D. McCarthy, in case 19-17294. [11514365] (NAC) [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:54 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lewis S. Yelin (Appellate Staff, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Rm. 7239, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellee Ryan D. McCarthy. Date of service: 11/27/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11514357] [19-17294] (Yelin, Lewis) [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:51 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11501303]. [19-17294] (AD) [Entered: 11/15/2019 06:44 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Jeffrey K. Plaskett Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/15/2019. [11500865] [19-17294] (Musell, Wendy) [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:35 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jeffrey K. Plaskett Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/19/2019. Transcript ordered by 12/09/2019. Transcript due 01/06/2020. Appellant Jeffrey K. Plaskett opening brief due 02/18/2020. Appellee Ryan D. McCarthy answering brief due 03/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11496370] (JBS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey Plaskett v. Ryan McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN D. MCCARTHY, Secretary, U. S. Department of the Army
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Represented By: Lewis Yelin Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY K. PLASKETT
Represented By: Wendy Ellen Musell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?