Donald Mitchell, Jr. v. Carrie Alvarado, et al
Defendant: JERRY HOWELL, Warden, TIMOTHY FILSON, DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden, PERRY RUSSELL, ANTHONY WARREN, BRUCE STROUD and STATE OF NEVADA, rel Nevada Department of Corrections
Plaintiff / Appellee: DONALD E. MITCHELL, Jr.
Defendant / Appellant: BIANCA KNIGHT-GROOVER and CARRIE ALVARADO, female officer
Case Number: 19-17350
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Appellee Donald E. Mitchell, Jr. letter dated 01/06/2020 re: Request for copy of rules book and docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. (Sent copy of rules & docket sheet) [11562383] (RL) [Entered: 01/14/2020 04:11 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Jared M. Frost substituted by Attorney Frank Anthony Toddre II. [11507941] (RL) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:06 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Frank A. Toddre, II (Office of the Nevada Attorney General, 555 East Washington Ave., Ste 3900, Las Vegas, NV 89101) for Appellants Carrie Alvarado and Bianca Knight-Groover. Substitution for Attorney Jared M. Frost for Appellants Carrie Alvarado and Bianca Knight-Groover. Date of service: 11/21/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11507712] [19-17350] (Toddre, Frank) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:20 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 12/20/2019. Transcript due 01/21/2020. Appellants Carrie Alvarado and Bianca Knight-Groover opening brief due 02/28/2020. Appellee Donald E. Mitchell Jr. answering brief due 03/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11505660] (JBS) [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald Mitchell, Jr. v. Carrie Alvarado, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY HOWELL, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY FILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWIGHT NEVEN, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRY RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE STROUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEVADA, rel Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD E. MITCHELL, Jr.
Represented By: Donald E. Mitchell Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BIANCA KNIGHT-GROOVER
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARRIE ALVARADO, female officer
Represented By: Frank Anthony Toddre II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?