Judy Codding v. Pearson Education, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JUDY CODDING
Case Number: 19-17454
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11552368] (BLS) [Entered: 01/06/2020 03:55 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/06/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11542769] (BLS) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:08 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/06/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11524610]. [19-17454] (AD) [Entered: 12/06/2019 06:44 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Judy Codding Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/06/2019. [11524325] [19-17454] (Kieve, Loren) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:42 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Judy Codding Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/13/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/06/2020. Transcript due 02/03/2020. Appellant Judy Codding opening brief due 03/16/2020. Appellee Pearson Education, Inc. answering brief due 04/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11523633] (JBS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judy Codding v. Pearson Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.
Represented By: David W. Marston Jr.
Represented By: Dana Elizabeth Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUDY CODDING
Represented By: Loren Kieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?