Ditech Financial LLC, et al v. Eagle Investors
Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing, LLC and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Counter Claimant: EAGLE INVESTORS
Case Number: 19-17495
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Ditech Financial LLC Correspondence: Notice of Bankruptcy Status. Date of service: 12/18/2019. [11536564] [19-17495] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 12/18/2019 by TYL] (Dodrill, Colt) [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:15 AM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11536349]. [19-17495] (AD) [Entered: 12/17/2019 06:44 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Eagle Investors Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/17/2019. [11535919] [19-17495] (Ayon, Luis) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:43 PM]
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Eagle Investors Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/20/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2020. Transcript due 02/10/2020. Appellant Eagle Investors opening brief due 03/23/2020. Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association answering brief due 04/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11531432] (JBS) [Entered: 12/13/2019 10:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ditech Financial LLC, et al v. Eagle Investors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, FKA Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Daniela Madrid
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Daniela Madrid
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: EAGLE INVESTORS
Represented By: Luis A. Ayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?