S Farms, et al v. United Grain Corporation of Or
Plaintiff / Appellee: S FARMS and SINGLETON FARMS
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED GRAIN CORPORATION OF OREGON, an Oregon Domestic Business Corporation
Case Number: 19-35005
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 05/06/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11217630] [19-35005, 19-35054] (MS) [Entered: 03/06/2019 09:26 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/05/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11182179] [19-35005, 19-35054] (VS) [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:37 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/31/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11175214] (AD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 06:44 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants S Farms and Singleton Farms in 19-35054, Appellees S Farms and Singleton Farms in 19-35005 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/31/2019. [11174565] [19-35054, 19-35005] (Knobel, David) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:28 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Added attorney David F. Knobel I for S Farms Singleton Farms, in case 19-35005 David F. Knobel I for S Farms Singleton Farms, in case 19-35054. [11174543] [19-35005, 19-35054] (CW) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:22 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Francis Knobel for Appellees S Farms and Singleton Farms in 19-35005, Appellants S Farms and Singleton Farms in 19-35054. Date of service: 01/31/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11174487] [19-35005, 19-35054] (Knobel, David) [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:57 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/31/2019. First cross appeal brief due 04/15/2019 for United Grain Corporation of Oregon. Second brief on cross appeal due 05/14/2019 for S Farms and Singleton Farms. Third brief on cross appeal due 06/14/2019 for United Grain Corporation of Oregon. Optional cross appeal reply brief for S Farms and Singleton Farms is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [11165305] [19-35054, 19-35005] (RT) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:18 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/30/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11152419] (VS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:04 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/07/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11143468] (AD) [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:45 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant United Grain Corporation of Oregon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/07/2019. [11143457] [19-35005] (Snedigar, Daniel) [Entered: 01/07/2019 12:38 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellant United Grain Corporation of Oregon opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellees S Farms and Singleton Farms answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141334] (JMR) [Entered: 01/04/2019 09:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: S Farms, et al v. United Grain Corporation of Or
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: S FARMS
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Michael Tennant
Represented By: David F. Knobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SINGLETON FARMS
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Michael Tennant
Represented By: David F. Knobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED GRAIN CORPORATION OF OREGON, an Oregon Domestic Business Corporation
Represented By: Daniel L. Snedigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?