American Hallmark Insurance Co v. Oregon Interiors, Inc., et al

Undetermined: BROOKE ENSLEY, an individual, AARON ENSLEY, an individual, OREGON INTERIORS, INC., an Oregon corporation and AMERICAN HALLMARK INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, a foreign corporation
Case Number: 19-35025
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11216336] (LW) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:33 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [8] is rejected. Filer is not permitted to file on behalf of another attorney. Each attorney must file their own notice of appearance. [11171978] (RR) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:54 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Added attorney Don R. Sampen for American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, in case 19-35025. [11171977] (RR) [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:53 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Melinda S. Kollross for Appellee American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. Date of service: 01/29/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11171120] [19-35025] (Sampen, Don) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:55 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Don, R. Sampen for Appellee American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas. Date of service: 01/29/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11171110] [19-35025] (Sampen, Don) [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:53 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 02/13/2019, 10:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11165331] (LW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:28 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11160012] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 06:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11160010] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 06:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants Aaron Ensley, Brooke Ensley and Oregon Interiors, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11159421] [19-35025] (Carney, Sean) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:17 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellee American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11159403] [19-35025] (Rossmiller, David) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:08 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/11/2019. Transcript due 03/11/2019. Appellants Aaron Ensley, Brooke Ensley and Oregon Interiors, Inc. opening brief due 04/22/2019. Appellee American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas answering brief due 05/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11149628] (JBS) [Entered: 01/11/2019 09:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Hallmark Insurance Co v. Oregon Interiors, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BROOKE ENSLEY, an individual
Represented By: Sean W. Carney
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AARON ENSLEY, an individual
Represented By: Sean W. Carney
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: OREGON INTERIORS, INC., an Oregon corporation
Represented By: Sean W. Carney
Represented By: Michael E. Farnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: AMERICAN HALLMARK INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, a foreign corporation
Represented By: Elissa Marie Boyd
Represented By: Don R. Sampen Esquire
Represented By: David Phillip Rossmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?