William Nordholm v. Tim Barkell, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TIM BARKELL, MARK DURKIN, ANACONDA-DEER LODGE COUNTY, RICHARD PASHA, BRENDAN STALEY, JOHN DOE and BILL SATHER
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM J. NORDHOLM
Case Number: 19-35357
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 10, 2020 WILLIAM NORDHOLM V. TIM BARKELL

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): On April 30 2019, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. To date, appellant has not complied with this order. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall sign and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The briefing schedule established on April 29, 2019 shall continue in effect. The Clerk shall send a copy of the April 30. 2019 order to appellant along with this order. [11334476] (CKP) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:22 PM]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11282256] (CKP) [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:26 PM]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/29/2019. Transcript due 06/28/2019. Appellant William J. Nordholm opening brief due 08/07/2019. Appellees Anaconda-Deer Lodge County, Tim Barkell, John Doe, Mark Durkin, Richard Pasha, Bill Sather and Brendan Staley answering brief due 09/06/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11280814] (JMR) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Nordholm v. Tim Barkell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIM BARKELL
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK DURKIN
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANACONDA-DEER LODGE COUNTY
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD PASHA
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDAN STALEY
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL SATHER
Represented By: Cynthia L. Walker Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM J. NORDHOLM
Represented By: William J. Nordholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?