Ray Helveston v. Laura Brooks, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: RAY C. HELVESTON
Defendant / Appellee: ANGIE STROMMER, FNP, LAURA BROOKS, Medical Advisory, SHAWN STRONG, RN III, CAROL BACA, RN and CLINTON DEAVER, RN
Case Number: 19-35536
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): On June 27, 2019, this court ordered appellant to complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form. Appellants motion for an extension of time to comply with the June 27, 2019 order is granted in part [ # 3 ]. Within 60 days after the date of this order, appellant shall sign and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellants institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellants trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. If appellant wishes to move for appointment of counsel on appeal, he must file a separate motion requesting that relief. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. The Clerk shall send a copy of the June 27, 2019 order to appellant along with this order. [11373589] (CKP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:47 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Ray C. Helveston motion to extend time. Deficiencies: None. [11365405] (JFF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:27 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11346743] (CKP) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:13 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ray C. Helveston opening brief due 08/23/2019. Appellees Carol Baca, Laura Brooks, Clinton Deaver, Angie Strommer and Shawn Strong answering brief due 09/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11344331] (JPD) [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ray Helveston v. Laura Brooks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAY C. HELVESTON
Represented By: Ray C. Helveston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGIE STROMMER, FNP
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA BROOKS, Medical Advisory
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN STRONG, RN III
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAROL BACA, RN
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLINTON DEAVER, RN
Represented By: Matthias R. Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?