Emmanuel Adeyinka v. Brady Barrs, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ARMSTRONG, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, BRADY BARRS and C. AQUILERA
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMMANUEL ADEWALE ADEYINKA
Case Number: 19-35772
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Mail returned on 11/01/2019 addressed to Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka, re: 09/24/2019 order [ # 6 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, undeliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; no forwarding address found. [11490171] (LA) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:52 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not complied with the portion of this courts September 24, 2019 order directing appellant to file a statement explaining why this appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall file a statement in this court in response to the September 24, 2019 order. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The briefing schedule remains stayed. Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis will be addressed by separate order after appellant files a statement in response to the September 24, 2019 order. The Clerk shall send a copy of the September 24, 2019 order to appellant along with this order. [11487440] (CKP) [Entered: 11/04/2019 10:58 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka Form CJA 23 financial affidavit. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11466966] (QDL) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:17 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/09/2019. [11466956] (QDL) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:16 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court revoked appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis because it found that the action was frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. All pending motions will be addressed after appellants compliance with this order. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11441615] (CKP) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:22 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-35772: Due] ). [11436126] (CO) [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:34 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Received copy of District Court order filed on 09/11/2019 revoking plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. [11434949] (QDL) [Entered: 09/17/2019 05:04 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11432464] (CKP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:22 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 09/09/2019. [11426751] (HC) [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:24 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka opening brief due 11/08/2019. (No appearance for Appellees, no answering brief deadlines set) [11426746] (HC) [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel Adeyinka v. Brady Barrs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADY BARRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. AQUILERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL ADEWALE ADEYINKA
Represented By: Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?