State of Oregon, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Defendant / Appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, Attorney General of the United States, in his official capacity and DONALD J. TRUMP, President of the United States, in his official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellee: ELLEN ROSENBLUM, Attorney General, CITY OF PORTLAND, KATE BROWN, Governor and STATE OF OREGON
Case Number: 19-35843
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Filed AMENDED order MEDIATION (SL): These appeals remained stayed pending further order of this court. Counsel should contact the undersigned by email (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov) within 10 days after this courts decision in City & County of San Francisco v. Barr, Appeal Nos. 18-17308, 18-17311. [11494591] [19-55314, 19-15947, 19-15950, 19-35843] (AF) [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:31 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Filed order MEDIATION (SL): VThe briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. Counsel should contact the undersigned by email (stephen_liacouras@ca9.uscourts.gov) within 10 days after the courts decision in Appeal No. 18-56292. [11470988] (OC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 11:01 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Terminated Daniel D. Mauler for USA, Donald J. Trump and William P. Barr in 19-35843 (for failure to register for Appellate ECF) [11469493] (JBS) [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:19 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/11/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11462047][19-35843] (AD) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:44 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants William P. Barr, Donald J. Trump and USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11461875] [19-35843] (Weiner, Sarah) [Entered: 10/11/2019 11:22 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney Sarah Weiner for party Appellant William P. Barr Appellant USA Appellant Donald J. Trump, in case 19-35843. [11459519] (JFF) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:44 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Added Attorney Daniel Tenny for partyAppellant William P. Barr Appellant USA Appellant Donald J. Trump, in case 19-35843. [11459506] (JFF) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:42 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Elizabeth Weiner (United States Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellants William P. Barr, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 10/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11458800] [19-35843] (Weiner, Sarah) [Entered: 10/09/2019 08:19 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellants William P. Barr, Donald J. Trump and USA. Substitution for Attorney Daniel D. Mauler for Appellants William P. Barr, Donald J. Trump and USA. Date of service: 10/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11458744] [19-35843] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 10/09/2019 07:35 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/04/2019. Transcript due 12/03/2019. Appellants William P. Barr, Attorney General, Donald J. Trump and United States of America opening brief due 01/13/2020. Appellees Kate Brown, City of Portland, Ellen Rosenblum and State of Oregon answering brief due 02/11/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11454019] (JBS) [Entered: 10/04/2019 09:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of Oregon, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Sarah Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, Attorney General of the United States, in his official capacity
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Sarah Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, President of the United States, in his official capacity
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Sarah Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLEN ROSENBLUM, Attorney General
Represented By: Peenesh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF PORTLAND
Represented By: Tracy Pool Reeve
Represented By: Denis M. Vannier Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KATE BROWN, Governor
Represented By: Peenesh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Peenesh Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?