Douglas Baker, et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellee: MARIA KAY DUPUIS-BAKER, as a married couple and DOUGLAS R. BAKER
Defendant / Appellant: CMH HOMES, INC., a Tennessee Corporation, DBA Clayton Homes #742
Case Number: 19-35863
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 01/18/2020. :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 03/27/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 04/27/2020Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11527383] (LW) [Entered: 12/10/2019 01:38 PM]
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/06/2019. See order for details. [11509330] (LW) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:43 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/22/2019. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 01/08/2020. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 02/07/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within twenty one 21 days from the service date of the answer brief. See order for details. [11496609] (LW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:01 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 11/12/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11473473] (LW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:41 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11472187][19-35863] (AD) [Entered: 10/21/2019 06:44 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11471398] [19-35863] (Nelson, Tamara) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:27 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) W. Scott Simpson for party(s) Appellant CMH Homes, Inc.. [11469753] (RL) [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:14 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Wayne Scott Simpson (Simpson, McMahan, Glick & Burford, PLLC) for Appellant CMH Homes, Inc.. Date of service: 10/18/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11469671] [19-35863] (Simpson, W.) [Entered: 10/18/2019 12:23 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/22/2019. Appellant CMH Homes, Inc. opening brief due 12/13/2019. Appellees Douglas R. Baker and Maria Kay DuPuis-Baker answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11464086] (HC) [Entered: 10/15/2019 12:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Baker, et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA KAY DUPUIS-BAKER, as a married couple
Represented By: Katie J. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOUGLAS R. BAKER
Represented By: Katie J. Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CMH HOMES, INC., a Tennessee Corporation, DBA Clayton Homes #742
Represented By: Tamara K. Nelson
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?