Wilbert Anaya Murcia v. Elizabeth Godfrey, et al
Respondent / Appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary of Department of Homeland Security, MATTHEW ALBENCE, Acting Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, JOHN P. SANDERS, Senior Official Performing the Functions and Duties of the Commissioner of Customs and Border Protection, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, United States Attorney General and ELIZABETH GODFREY, Field Office Director for Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Seattle Field Office
Petitioner / Appellant: WILBERT ALEXANDER ANAYA MURCIA
Case Number: 19-35913
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Terminated attorney Leila Kang for appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia in 19-35913. [11527711] (HH) [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:33 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Ms. Leila Kang for Appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 12/10/2019. [11527587] [19-35913] (Kang, Leila) [Entered: 12/10/2019 02:52 PM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LAB): A review of the district court docket reflects that the district court granted petitioner-appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis and that such permission has not been revoked. Accordingly, petitioner-appellants in forma pauperis status continues in this court. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Petitioner-appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is therefore unnecessary. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due January 21, 2020; the answering brief is due February 20, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11525755] (JPD) [Entered: 12/09/2019 01:58 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Received copy of District Court order filed on 11/12/2019 granting ifp. [11497427] (CW) [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:56 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/20/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11492434] (LW) [Entered: 11/07/2019 11:21 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11489658]. [19-35913] (AD) [Entered: 11/05/2019 12:44 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/05/2019. [11489073] [19-35913] (Korthuis, Aaron) [Entered: 11/05/2019 09:06 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/31/2019. [11484861] (HC) [Entered: 10/31/2019 12:19 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/07/2019. Appellant Wilbert Alexander Anaya Murcia opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees Matthew Albence, William P. Barr, Attorney General, Elizabeth Godfrey, Kevin K. McAleenan, John P. Sanders and U.S. Department of Homeland Security answering brief due 01/29/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11484855] (HC) [Entered: 10/31/2019 12:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wilbert Anaya Murcia v. Elizabeth Godfrey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Secretary of Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MATTHEW ALBENCE, Acting Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JOHN P. SANDERS, Senior Official Performing the Functions and Duties of the Commissioner of Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ELIZABETH GODFREY, Field Office Director for Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Seattle Field Office
Represented By: Carlton Frederick Sheffield
Represented By: Kristin Berger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILBERT ALEXANDER ANAYA MURCIA
Represented By: Leila Kang
Represented By: Maria Lucia Chavez
Represented By: Aaron Korthuis
Represented By: Matt Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?