Frank Bellospirito v. Willis Campbell
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRANK BELLOSPIRITO
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIS CAMPBELL, IRS Agent, In his Individual capacity
Case Number: 19-55023
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Frank Bellospirito supplemental brief (Informal: No) 5 pages. Served on 02/11/2019. Major deficiencies: motion required. Notified appellant. [11211776] (KT) [Entered: 02/28/2019 02:50 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Received original and 1 copies of Appellant Frank Bellospirito opening brief (Informal: No) 7 pages. Served on 02/02/2019. Major deficiencies: IFP motion pending. [11198415] (KT) [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:44 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Frank Bellospirito motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis (FORM 4). Deficiencies: No certificate of service. [11163695] (RR) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:21 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Frank Bellospirito letter dated 01/12/2019 re: unable to pay filing fee. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11156357] (RR) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:13 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Added attorney Gretchen M. Wolfinger for Willis Campbell, in case 19-55023. [11155741] (RR) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:20 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Gretchen M. Wolfinger for Appellee Willis Campbell. Date of service: 01/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11155435] [19-55023] (Wolfinger, Gretchen) [Entered: 01/16/2019 12:40 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11151390] (CKP) [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:40 AM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellant Frank Bellospirito opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellee Willis Campbell answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11143282] (HC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Bellospirito v. Willis Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK BELLOSPIRITO
Represented By: Frank Bellospirito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIS CAMPBELL, IRS Agent, In his Individual capacity
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Pribe
Represented By: Gretchen M. Wolfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?