Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc., et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Plaintiff: FRED BURBANK, MD, CEO, President, Board Chairman, and stock holder
Defendant: LAURENCE WILSON, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, SEEMA VERMA, Administrator Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, DEMETRIOS KOUZOUKAS, Principal Deputy Administrator Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, WILFRED MAMUYA, MD, PhD Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction A, STACEY V. BRENNAN, M.D., FAAFP, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction B, PETER J. GURK, MD, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction D and ROBERT D. HOOVER, Jr., MD, MPH, FACP, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction C
Plaintiff / Appellant: SENSORY NEUROSTIMULATION, INC., a California corporation
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES and ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 19-55036
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Added attorney Linda T. Coberly for Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc., in case 19-55036. [11219899] (JFF) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:11 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc.. Date of service: 03/06/2019. [11218878] [19-55036] (Gailey, Lauren) [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:50 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc. notice of intent to unseal previously sealed material. Material: other (Brief and vol. II of excerpts of record). Date of service: 03/06/2019. [11218877] [19-55036]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice and brief. 03/07/2019 by SLM] (Gailey, Lauren) [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:48 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Linda T. Coberly for Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc.. Date of service: 03/06/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11218869] [19-55036] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 03/06/2019 06:27 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Added attorney Lauren Gailey for Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc., in case 19-55036. [11200112] (JFF) [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:31 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lauren Gailey for Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc.. Date of service: 02/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11199538] [19-55036] (Gailey, Lauren) [Entered: 02/19/2019 02:11 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11198372] (VS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:15 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/15/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11175473] (VS) [Entered: 02/01/2019 09:21 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11155447] (AD) [Entered: 01/16/2019 12:44 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/16/2019. [11155136] [19-55036] (Rostamian, Saul) [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:52 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/16/2019. Appellant Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc. opening brief due 03/06/2019. Appellees Alex M. Azar II, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services and U.S. Department of Health & Human Services answering brief due 04/08/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11146411] (RT) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sensory NeuroStimulation, Inc., et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED BURBANK, MD, CEO, President, Board Chairman, and stock holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURENCE WILSON, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEEMA VERMA, Administrator Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMETRIOS KOUZOUKAS, Principal Deputy Administrator Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILFRED MAMUYA, MD, PhD Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACEY V. BRENNAN, M.D., FAAFP, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER J. GURK, MD, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT D. HOOVER, Jr., MD, MPH, FACP, Medical Director, DME MAC, Jurisdiction C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SENSORY NEUROSTIMULATION, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Saul S. Rostamian
Represented By: Diana Leiden
Represented By: Lauren Gailey Esquire
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Karen Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Karen Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Karen Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?