DCD Partners, LLC, et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co

Defendant / Appellant: TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ; successor in interest to Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellee: DCD PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company, PERSONAL INVOLVEMENT CENTER, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company and BENJAMIN HARDWICK, Reverend Dr., as trustee of the Personal Involvement Center Trust No. 1
Case Number: 19-55037
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/05/2019, 3:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11158266] (MS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:53 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11156370] (AD) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:45 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Transamerica Life Insurance Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/16/2019. [11155589] [19-55037] (Hetherington, Thomas) [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:40 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/16/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/07/2019. Transcript due 03/11/2019. Appellant Transamerica Life Insurance Company opening brief due 04/18/2019. Appellees DCD Partners, LLC, Benjamin Hardwick and Personal Involvement Center, LLC answering brief due 05/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11146443] (JBS) [Entered: 01/09/2019 10:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DCD Partners, LLC, et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ; successor in interest to Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas F. A. Hetherington
Represented By: Jarrett Earl Ganer
Represented By: Hutson Brit Smelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DCD PARTNERS, LLC, a California limited liability company
Represented By: Michael J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PERSONAL INVOLVEMENT CENTER, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Represented By: Michael J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BENJAMIN HARDWICK, Reverend Dr., as trustee of the Personal Involvement Center Trust No. 1
Represented By: Michael J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?