Cheap Easy Online Traffic Sch., et al v. Peter L. Huntting & Co., Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: ESTATE OF PETER L. HUNTTING, WILLIAM SHEFFLER, DOES, 1 to 100 inclusive, SHEFFLER CONSULTING ACTUARIES, INC., ECONOMIC GROUP PENSION SERVICES GROUP, INC., PETER L. HUNTTING & CO., INC., SMI PENSIONS and MIKE EDWARDS
Plaintiff / Appellant: BORNA MOZAFARI AND MARLA KELLER AS TRUSTEES FOR CHEAP EASY ON-LINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL PENSION PLAN, MARLA KELLER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE MARLA KELLER PENSION PLAN AND MARLA KELLER 401(K) PLAN, CHEAP EASY ONLINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL, BORNA MOZAFARI AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CHEAP EASY ON-LINE PROFIT SHARING PLAN and EASY ON LINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL.COM, INC.
Case Number: 19-55055
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 04/04/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11223520] (CL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:20 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Terminated Appellees Economic Group Pension Services Group, Inc. and Mike Edwards in 19-55055 [11189141] (OC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:03 PM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): Appellants motion to dismiss this appeal as to appellees Mike Edwards and Economic Group Pension Services, Inc., only (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court as to Mike Edwards and Economic Group Pension Services, Inc., only. This appeal remains pending as to all other appellees. [11189136] (OC) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:01 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Borna Mozafari and Marla Keller as Trustees for Cheap Easy On-Line Traffic School Pension Plan, Borna Mozafari as Trustee for the Cheap Easy On-Line Profit Sharing Plan, Cheap Easy Online Traffic School, Easy On Line Traffic School.Com, Inc. and Marla Keller as Trustee for the Marla Keller Pension Plan and Marla Keller 401(K) Plan Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 02/11/2019. [11186549] [19-55055] (Horton, Lincoln) [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:46 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 03/07/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11182160] (VS) [Entered: 02/07/2019 09:28 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/01/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11157513] (VS) [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:10 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11154543] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:44 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marla Keller as Trustee for the Marla Keller Pension Plan and Marla Keller 401(K) Plan, Borna Mozafari and Marla Keller as Trustees for Cheap Easy On-Line Traffic School Pension Plan, Borna Mozafari as Trustee for the Cheap Easy On-Line Profit Sharing Plan, Cheap Easy Online Traffic School and Easy On Line Traffic School.Com, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11153915] [19-55055] (Horton, Lincoln) [Entered: 01/15/2019 01:53 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/11/2019. Transcript due 03/12/2019. Appellants Borna Mozafari and Marla Keller as Trustees for Cheap Easy On-Line Traffic School Pension Plan, Borna Mozafari as Trustee for the Cheap Easy On-Line Profit Sharing Plan, Cheap Easy Online Traffic School, Easy On Line Traffic School.Com, Inc. and Marla Keller as Trustee for the Marla Keller Pension Plan and Marla Keller 401(K) Plan opening brief due 04/22/2019. Appellees Does, Economic Group Pension Services Group, Inc., Mike Edwards, Estate of Peter L. Huntting, Peter L. Huntting & Co., Inc., SMI Pensions, William Sheffler and Sheffler Consulting Actuaries, Inc. answering brief due 05/21/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11151385] (JBS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheap Easy Online Traffic Sch., et al v. Peter L. Huntting & Co., Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ESTATE OF PETER L. HUNTTING
Represented By: Corey Francis Schechter Esquire
Represented By: Marc Schechter Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM SHEFFLER
Represented By: Thomas M. Monson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 to 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHEFFLER CONSULTING ACTUARIES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Monson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ECONOMIC GROUP PENSION SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER L. HUNTTING & CO., INC.
Represented By: Corey Francis Schechter Esquire
Represented By: Marc Schechter Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SMI PENSIONS
Represented By: Thomas M. Monson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BORNA MOZAFARI AND MARLA KELLER AS TRUSTEES FOR CHEAP EASY ON-LINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL PENSION PLAN
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARLA KELLER AS TRUSTEE FOR THE MARLA KELLER PENSION PLAN AND MARLA KELLER 401(K) PLAN
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHEAP EASY ONLINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BORNA MOZAFARI AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CHEAP EASY ON-LINE PROFIT SHARING PLAN
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EASY ON LINE TRAFFIC SCHOOL.COM, INC.
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?