Samuel Barreras, Jr. v. Nancy Berryhill
Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff / Appellant: SAMUEL J. BARRERAS, Jr.
Case Number: 19-55060
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 8 ] in 3 volume(s) filed by Appellant Samuel J. Barreras, Jr.. [11228410] (KWG) [Entered: 03/14/2019 03:24 PM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 7 ] submitted by Samuel J. Barreras, Jr. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 8 ] submitted by Samuel J. Barreras, Jr.. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11221010] (KWG) [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:17 AM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Samuel J. Barreras, Jr.. Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219697] [19-55060] (Monge, Troy) [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:57 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Samuel J. Barreras, Jr.. Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219679] [19-55060] (Monge, Troy) [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:53 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Samuel J. Barreras, Jr.. Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219668] [19-55060]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached addendum. 03/08/2019 by SLM] (Monge, Troy) [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:49 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11169215] (BS) [Entered: 01/28/2019 01:13 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney In Seon Jeong substituted by Attorney Annabelle Yang. [11164206] (RL) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:43 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Annabelle Yang for Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill. Substitution for Attorney In Seon Jeong for Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill. Date of service: 01/23/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11164169] [19-55060] (Yang, Annabelle) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:33 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11160011] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 06:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Samuel J. Barreras, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11159405] [19-55060] (Monge, Troy) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:08 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Appellant Samuel J. Barreras Jr. opening brief due 03/12/2019. Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill answering brief due 04/11/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11151921] (JMR) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuel Barreras, Jr. v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Annabelle Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL J. BARRERAS, Jr.
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?