Antonio Pureco, et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company

Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID CARRILLO, by and through his Conservator, Felipe Carrillo and ANTONIO PURECO, a California individual
Defendant / Appellee: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation
Case Number: 19-55061
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11211428] (CL) [Entered: 02/28/2019 12:31 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/28/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11185250] (VS) [Entered: 02/11/2019 10:19 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11162441] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 06:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Carrillo and Antonio Pureco Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161642] [19-55061] (Schuetze, Steven) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:01 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Added attorney Thomas R. Proctor for Allstate Indemnity Company. [11155736] (RL) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:19 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Thomas Robbert Proctor for Appellee Allstate Indemnity Company. Date of service: 01/15/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11154077] [19-55061] (Proctor, Thomas) [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:42 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/13/2019. Transcript due 03/15/2019. Appellants David Carrillo and Antonio Pureco opening brief due 04/24/2019. Appellee Allstate Indemnity Company answering brief due 05/24/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11152472] (JBS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Pureco, et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID CARRILLO, by and through his Conservator, Felipe Carrillo
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria Esquire
Represented By: Steven Schuetze Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONIO PURECO, a California individual
Represented By: Ricardo Echeverria Esquire
Represented By: Steven Schuetze Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey Isaac Ehrlich Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation
Represented By: Marc Jeremy Feldman Esquire
Represented By: Thomas R. Proctor
Represented By: Peter Klee Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?