Ryan E. v. Entertainment Industry Flex Pl, et al
Defendant: ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant / Appellee: ENTERTAINMENT INDUSTRY FLEX PLAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: RYAN E.
Case Number: 19-55131
Filed: January 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference w/ counsel for appellant only, 03/15/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. FurtherConference w/ counsel for appellee only, 03/15/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11219447] (MS) [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:24 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/07/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11190484] (CL) [Entered: 02/14/2019 12:44 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/07/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11182619] (AD) [Entered: 02/07/2019 12:44 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ryan E. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/07/2019. [11182075] [19-55131] (Petti, Russell) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:53 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/07/2019. Transcript ordered by 03/04/2019. Transcript due 04/01/2019. Appellant Ryan E. opening brief due 05/13/2019. Appellee Entertainment Industry Flex Plan answering brief due 06/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11174735] (JPD) [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan E. v. Entertainment Industry Flex Pl, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENTERTAINMENT INDUSTRY FLEX PLAN
Represented By: Kevin Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN E.
Represented By: Russell George Petti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?