Pedro Reyes v. Rogelio Ortega, et al
Defendant: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., Governor for State of California
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN DOE, Correctional Sergeant, BELTRAN, Correctional Nurse, RAYMOND MADDEN, Warden, ROGELIO ORTEGA, Doctor at Centinela Desert Institute and JOHN DOE, Correctional Officers 1 thru 5
Plaintiff / Appellant: PEDRO REYES
Case Number: 19-55405
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Streamlined request by Appellant Pedro Reyes to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Pedro Reyes opening brief due 07/08/2019. Appellees Beltran, John Doe, Raymond Madden, Warden and Rogelio Ortega answering brief due 08/07/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11318425] (BG) [Entered: 06/04/2019 09:02 AM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Attorneys Terrence F. Sheehy, Terrence F. Sheehy and Terrence F. Sheehy in 19-55405 substituted by Attorneys Misha Igra, Misha Igra and Misha Igra in 19-55405 [11315117] (CW) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:55 AM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Misha D. Igra for Appellees Beltran, Raymond Madden and Rogelio Ortega. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Terrence F. Sheehy, Esquire for Appellees Beltran, Raymond Madden and Rogelio Ortega. Date of service: 05/31/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11315003] [19-55405] (Igra, Misha) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:58 AM]
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11310338] (CKP) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:11 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 05/19/2019. [Case Number 19-55405: Partially Paid] [11306375] (RL) [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:53 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11298224] (CKP) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:02 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Pedro Reyes opposition to 4/10/19 order. Served on 04/20/2019. [11278108] (CW) [Entered: 04/26/2019 07:30 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11259182] (CKP) [Entered: 04/10/2019 11:18 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Pedro Reyes opening brief due 06/07/2019. Appellees Beltran, John Doe, Raymond Madden, Warden and Rogelio Ortega answering brief due 07/08/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11258273] (HC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pedro Reyes v. Rogelio Ortega, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Correctional Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELTRAN, Correctional Nurse
Represented By: Terrence F. Sheehy Esquire
Represented By: Misha Igra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND MADDEN, Warden
Represented By: Terrence F. Sheehy Esquire
Represented By: Misha Igra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROGELIO ORTEGA, Doctor at Centinela Desert Institute
Represented By: Terrence F. Sheehy Esquire
Represented By: Misha Igra Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, Correctional Officers 1 thru 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., Governor for State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO REYES
Represented By: Pedro Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?