Clemente Huerta-Jimenez, et al v. Kirstjen Nielsen, et al
Respondent / Appellee: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General, Acting Attorney General of the United States and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Petitioner / Appellant: ERMELINDA PEREZ and CLEMENTE HUERTA-JIMENEZ
Case Number: 19-55420
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Clemente Huerta-Jimenez to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. There is a pending motion to stay removal and if applicable, the briefing schedule will be reset upon resolution of the motion. [11317512] (BG) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:56 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Clemente Huerta-Jimenez and Ermelinda Perez. New requested due date is 07/10/2019. [11317410] [19-55420] (Dunnion, Donovan) [Entered: 06/03/2019 01:28 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Clemente Huerta-Jimenez Motion to stay removal. Date of service: 06/03/2019. [11317293] [19-55420] (Dunnion, Donovan) [Entered: 06/03/2019 12:46 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY and CARLOS T. BEA) As no order of removal has been filed and as petitioner is not in custody, the emergency motion for a stay of removal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied. See Nken v. Holder, 556 U.S. 418 (2009); Leiva-Perez v. Holder, 640 F.3d 962 (9th Cir. 2011). The briefing schedule established previously remains in effect. [11306400] (OC) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:06 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Clemente Huerta-Jimenez and Ermelinda Perez EMERGENCY Motion to stay removal. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304469] [19-55420] (Dunnion, Donovan) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:07 PM]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Clemente Huerta-Jimenez and Ermelinda Perez opening brief due 06/10/2019. [11261413] (OC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clemente Huerta-Jimenez, et al v. Kirstjen Nielsen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ERMELINDA PEREZ
Represented By: Donovan J. Dunnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CLEMENTE HUERTA-JIMENEZ
Represented By: Donovan J. Dunnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?