Holly Odd v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: DELTA FAMILY-CARE DISABILITY AND SURVIVORSHIP PLAN, an ERISA plan and DELTA AIR LINES, INC., a corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: HOLLY ODD
Case Number: 19-55555
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 15, 2020 HOLLY ODD V. DELTA AIR LINES, INC.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/15/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/19/2019 ). [11342130] (BS) [Entered: 06/24/2019 12:29 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/19/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11308115] (CL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:29 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11304424] (AD) [Entered: 05/21/2019 12:44 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304101] [19-55555] (McDonald, John) [Entered: 05/21/2019 10:24 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11298575] (AD) [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:44 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Holly Odd Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/15/2019. [11298415] [19-55555] (Fleishman, Paul) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:48 AM]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/21/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/12/2019. Transcript due 07/12/2019. Appellant Holly Odd opening brief due 08/21/2019. Appellees Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan answering brief due 09/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11296410] (JBS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Holly Odd v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA FAMILY-CARE DISABILITY AND SURVIVORSHIP PLAN, an ERISA plan
Represented By: Charles Neal Bland Esquire Jr.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELTA AIR LINES, INC., a corporation
Represented By: Charles Neal Bland Esquire Jr.
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOLLY ODD
Represented By: Paul Fleishman
Represented By: Charles Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?