Brand Tarzana Surgical Institu v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of IL
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRAND TARZANA SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC., a California Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS
Case Number: 19-55565
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11335900] (CL) [Entered: 06/18/2019 01:54 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Added attorney David Jason de Jesus for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. [11319735] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:15 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David J. de Jesus for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. Date of service: 06/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11319723] [19-55565] (de Jesus, David) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:11 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Raymond A. Cardozo for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. [11319716] (RL) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:09 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Raymond A. Cardozo for Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois. Date of service: 06/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11319701] [19-55565] (Cardozo, Raymond) [Entered: 06/04/2019 04:05 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. opening brief due 08/14/2019. Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois answering brief due 09/13/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11319068] (SB) [Entered: 06/04/2019 11:54 AM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc.. New requested due date is 08/14/2019. [11318880] [19-55565] (Williams, Richard) [Entered: 06/04/2019 10:54 AM]
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 06/07/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11308736] (CL) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:17 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11305072] (AD) [Entered: 05/21/2019 06:44 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/21/2019. [11304529] [19-55565] (Williams, Richard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:33 PM]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/23/2019. Appellant Brand Tarzana Surgical Institute, Inc. opening brief due 07/15/2019. Appellee Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois answering brief due 08/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11300191] (JBS) [Entered: 05/16/2019 01:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand Tarzana Surgical Institu v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of IL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAND TARZANA SURGICAL INSTITUTE, INC., a California Corporation
Represented By: Richard D. Williams Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger Esquire
Represented By: David Jason de Jesus Esquire
Represented By: Raymond A. Cardozo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?