Lyndsay Davidson, et al v. County of Los Angeles, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: LYNDSAY DAVIDSON, an Individual, W.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson, TYLER SPRADLING, an Individual, P.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson, R.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson, BRANDON SALINAS, an Individual and M.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson
Defendant / Appellee: PRINCESS MOTON, an Individual, SHEILA LOTA, an Individual, GEORGINA ACOSTA, an Individual, VICTORIA CISNEROS, an Individual, CYNTHIA WONG, an Individual, FNU PEREZ, an Individual, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, by and through The Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services and LILY RODRIGUEZ, an Individual
Case Number: 19-55645
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11382783] (BS) [Entered: 07/31/2019 12:52 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/30/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled for 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time). [11379529] (BS) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:32 PM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellants only, 07/30/2019, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. See order for details. [11378668] (BS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:56 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Terminated Clayton C. Averbuck for Cynthia Wong, Lily Rodriguez, Princess Moton, Sheila Lota, County of Los Angeles, Victoria Cisneros and Georgina Acosta in 19-55645 - DECEASED per CA bar. [11361713] (SLM) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:05 AM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/25/2019, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11342729] (BS) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:53 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/13/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11331010][19-55645] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2019 06:44 PM]
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Lyndsay Davidson, M.S., P.S., R.S., Brandon Salinas, Tyler Spradling and W.S. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/13/2019. [11330294] [19-55645] (Davis, Vincent) [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:12 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/13/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/05/2019. Transcript due 08/05/2019. Appellants Lyndsay Davidson, M.S., P.S., R.S., Brandon Salinas, Tyler Spradling and W.S. opening brief due 09/13/2019. Appellees Georgina Acosta, Victoria Cisneros, County of Los Angeles, Sheila Lota, Princess Moton, FNU Perez, Lily Rodriguez and Cynthia Wong answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11321609] (JBS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyndsay Davidson, et al v. County of Los Angeles, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYNDSAY DAVIDSON, an Individual
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: W.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TYLER SPRADLING, an Individual
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: P.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRANDON SALINAS, an Individual
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M.S., Minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Lyndsay Davidson
Represented By: Vincent Walter Davis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRINCESS MOTON, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHEILA LOTA, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEORGINA ACOSTA, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VICTORIA CISNEROS, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CYNTHIA WONG, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU PEREZ, an Individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, by and through The Los Angeles County Department of Children and Family Services
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LILY RODRIGUEZ, an Individual
Represented By: Clayton C. Averbuck Esquire
Represented By: Jennifer Gysler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?