Inez Tarver v. National Railroad Passenger Co, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, DBA Amtrak, PAMELA KEYES, JORGE RODRIGUEZ and RUDOLPH HAYNES
Plaintiff / Appellant: INEZ SUNTA TARVER
Case Number: 19-55647
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Brandie Nichole Charles for party(s) Appellee Pamela Keyes, in case 19-55647. [11386019] (JFF) [Entered: 08/02/2019 04:43 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brandie Nichole Charles (Littler Mendelson, PC, 2049 Century Park East, Fifth Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067.3107) for Appellees Pamela Keyes, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Jorge Rodriguez. Date of service: 08/02/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11385357] [19-55647] (Charles, Brandie) [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:46 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellees Pamela Keyes, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Jorge Rodriguez motion to maintain document under seal. Date of service: 08/01/2019. [11383947] [19-55647] (Hadaway, Chelsea) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:03 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Attorneys Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf substituted by Attorneys Chelsea Hadaway [11383872] (JFF) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:37 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Chelsea E. Hadaway (LITTLER MENDELSON, PC, 2049 Century Park East, 5th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067.3107) for Appellees Pamela Keyes, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Jorge Rodriguez. Substitution for Attorney Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf for Appellees Pamela Keyes, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Jorge Rodriguez. Date of service: 08/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11383838] [19-55647] (Hadaway, Chelsea) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:25 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Inez Sunta Tarver opening brief due 08/05/2019. Appellees Rudolph Haynes, Pamela Keyes, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and Jorge Rodriguez answering brief due 09/05/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11321668] (RT) [Entered: 06/06/2019 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Inez Tarver v. National Railroad Passenger Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, DBA Amtrak
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Represented By: Chelsea Hadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAMELA KEYES
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Represented By: Chelsea Hadaway
Represented By: Brandie Nichole Charles Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JORGE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Fatemeh Sadat Mashouf
Represented By: Chelsea Hadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUDOLPH HAYNES
Represented By: Brad Child
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INEZ SUNTA TARVER
Represented By: Inez Sunta Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?